judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0997-89
PD-0997-89
07/11/1989
PDR Case Type
SMART, VERLON DALE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/01/1989FINAL DISP/REHEARRefused
11/01/1989REHEAR DISPDENIED
10/05/1989REHEAR FILED
09/20/1989PDR DISPRefused
08/11/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
07/11/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/02/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn Holmes
SMART, VERLON DALEApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)George O. Jacobs
J. Gary Trichter
Court of Appeals Information:
01-88-01023-CR
Remanded 4-27-89
1st Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
County Criminal Court at Law No 6
Harris
Honorable J. R. MUSSLEWHITE
8818622