judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals

Case: 13-89-00265-CV
13-89-00265-CV
07/11/1989
Miscellaneous civil
O'Bryant, James B.
Texas Employers Insurance Association
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/01/1990Mandate Issued
05/01/1990ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come
04/12/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
12/14/1989Submitted
12/14/1989Submission
11/28/1989Entry of Judge Selection for Case.
11/17/1989Submission
09/29/1989Oral argument requested
09/29/1989Brief Filed
09/13/1989List of Authorities
09/05/1989Oral argument requested
09/05/1989Brief Does not Comply
09/05/1989Brief Filed
09/05/1989Case ready to be set
08/31/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
08/09/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
07/14/1989Due date for record to be filed
07/11/1989Transcript Filed
07/11/1989Statement of Facts Filed
07/11/1989Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks
07/11/1989Filing Fee Paid
07/11/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/01/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
117th District Court
Nueces
Honorable Robert Blackmon
87-3055-B