judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 11th Court Of Appeals

Case: 11-89-00213-CR
11-89-00213-CR
07/11/1989
Other Drug Possession
Williams, Sidney
Texas, The State of
No
1st Court of Appeals
07/11/1989
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/05/1990Mandate issued
12/26/1989Case returned from higher court
11/22/1989Petition for Discretionary Review in Criminal case or Petition for Review in Civil Case disposedRefused
09/25/1989Mot. on extension of time disposed in CCAMotion or Writ Granted
09/20/1989Case forwarded to higher court
09/14/1989Opinion issuedDismissed
09/14/1989Case reinstated
09/14/1989Case reinstated
09/12/1989Petition for Discretionary Review in Criminal case or Petition for Review in Civil Case
08/03/1989Opinion issued
08/03/1989Opinion issued
08/03/1989Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/11/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/11/1989Case ready to be set
07/11/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/05/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
230th District Court
Harris
Honorable Joe Kegans
499,542
2 yrs. TDC