judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 11th Court Of Appeals

Case: 11-89-00211-CV
11-89-00211-CV
07/11/1989
Divorce
McHugh, Edward Robert
McHugh, Maureen
No
1st Court of Appeals
07/11/1989
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/08/1991Mandate issued
02/07/1991Case returned from higher court
12/31/1990Application for writ of error disposedMotion or Writ Denied
11/15/1990Case forwarded to higher court
11/13/1990Express fee paid
11/05/1990Application fee paid
11/05/1990Application for writ of error
11/05/1990Express fee requested
10/04/1990Mot. - For rehearing disposedOverruled
09/10/1990Mot. - For rehearing filed
08/23/1990Opinion issuedModified and Affirmed
05/21/1990Submitted
05/21/1990Submission set in Eastland
03/27/1990Submission set in Eastland
07/11/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/11/1989Case ready to be set
07/11/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/08/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mchugh, MaureenAppelleeCandace Sturdivant
David A. Gibson
Mchugh, Edward RobertAppellantBruce Baughman
Trial Court Information
310th District Court
Harris
Honorable Allen J Daggett
1,083,210