judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 11th Court Of Appeals

Case: 11-89-00216-CR
11-89-00216-CR
07/11/1989
Robbery
Middleton, George Nicholas
Texas, The State of
No
1st Court of Appeals
07/11/1989
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/23/1990Mandate issued
06/21/1990Opinion issued
06/21/1990Opinion issued
06/21/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/22/1990Submitted
05/22/1990Submission set in Eastland
04/10/1990Letter filed from . . .
03/27/1990Submission set in Eastland
07/11/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/11/1989Case ready to be set
07/11/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/23/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
178th District Court
Harris
Honorable William T. Harmon
501,344
life