judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-6138
A-6138
12/18/1956
Application for Writ of Error
IOWA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
CLARENCE E. FAULKNER, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/04/1957Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/04/1957Brief on the MeritsRespondent
01/02/1957Response to PetitionRespondent
12/18/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/04/1957Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/27/1957Opinion issued
03/04/1957Brief on the Merits
02/24/1957Motion to dismiss
01/23/1957Document received (See Remarks)
01/23/1957Document received (See Remarks)
01/02/1957Response to Petition
12/18/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
12/18/1956Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Iowa Mutual Insurance CompanyPetitioner
Clarence E. Faulkner, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information