judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-3704
B-3704
12/08/1972
Application for Writ of Error
GULF INSURANCE COMPANY
PARKER PRODUCTS, INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
08/01/1973Motion for RehearingPetitioner
04/11/1973Response to PetitionRespondent
04/05/1973Amended PetitionPetitioner
02/15/1973Errata FiledPetitioner
12/27/1972Response to PetitionRespondent
12/08/1972Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
08/09/1973Response to Motion filed
08/01/1973Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/18/1973Opinion issued
04/11/1973Response to Petition
04/05/1973Amended Petition
02/15/1973Errata Filed
02/14/1973Document received (See Remarks)
12/27/1972Response to Petition
12/08/1972Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
12/08/1972Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Parker Products, Inc.Respondent
Gulf Insurance CompanyPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information