judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-3684
B-3684
11/20/1972
Direct Appeal
MORGAN DRIVE AWAY, INC., ET AL.
RAILROAD COMMISSION OF TEXAS, TRANSIT HOMES, INC., RAILROAD COMMISSION OF TEXAS, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/05/1973Amended motion for rehearing
05/09/1973Motion for Rehearing
05/08/1973Motion for Rehearing
02/23/1973Appendix Filed
02/23/1973Brief on the Merits
02/22/1973Brief on the Merits
01/15/1973Appellees' Brief filed
12/20/1972Appellant's Brief filed
11/20/1972Direct Appeal filed
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/05/1973Amended motion for rehearing
05/15/1973Response to Motion filed
05/09/1973Motion for Rehearing
05/08/1973Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/04/1973Miscellaneous letter
04/25/1973Dissenting opinion issued.
04/25/1973Opinion issued
02/23/1973Appendix Filed
02/23/1973Brief on the Merits
02/22/1973Brief on the Merits
01/15/1973Appellees' Brief filed
12/20/1972Appellant's Brief filed
11/20/1972Direct Appeal filed
11/20/1972Document received (See Remarks)
11/20/1972Document received (See Remarks)
11/20/1972Document received (See Remarks)
11/20/1972Document received (See Remarks)
11/20/1972Document received (See Remarks)
11/20/1972Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Transit Homes, Inc.Appellee
Railroad Commission of Texas, et al.Appellee
Morgan Drive Away, Inc., et al.Appellant
Railroad Commission of TexasAppellee
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information