judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-8620
B-8620
08/09/1979
MISC PETITION
TEXAS ALARM AND SIGNAL ASSOCIATION
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION, SOUTHWESTERN BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/12/1980Letter brief
04/10/1980Motion for Rehearing
02/08/1980Letter brief
02/06/1980Letter brief
12/12/1979Response to Brief filed
12/12/1979Response to Brief filed
12/05/1979Post submission brief filed
12/05/1979Post submission brief filed
12/05/1979Post submission brief filed
11/19/1979Response to Brief filed
10/31/1979Errata Filed
10/15/1979Appellees' Brief filed
10/15/1979Appellees' Brief filed
10/10/1979Supplemental Brief filed
08/09/1979Appellant's Brief filed
08/09/1979Appendix Filed
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/12/1980Letter brief
11/07/1980Miscellaneous MotionFiling granted
04/22/1980Response to Motion filed
04/18/1980Response to Motion filed
04/10/1980Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/26/1980Opinion issued
02/08/1980Letter brief
02/06/1980Letter brief
01/30/1980Letter Filed
12/12/1979Response to Brief filed
12/12/1979Response to Brief filed
12/05/1979Post submission brief filed
12/05/1979Post submission brief filed
12/05/1979Post submission brief filed
11/19/1979Response to Brief filed
10/31/1979Errata Filed
10/15/1979Appellees' Brief filed
10/15/1979Appellees' Brief filed
10/10/1979Supplemental Brief filed
08/24/1979Motion for Extension of Time filedFiling granted
08/22/1979Motion for Extension of Time filedFiling granted
08/09/1979Appellant's Brief filed
08/09/1979Appendix Filed
08/09/1979Document received (See Remarks)
08/09/1979Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSIONAppellee
SOUTHWESTERN BELL TELEPHONE COMPANYAppellee
Texas Alarm and SIgnal AssociationAppellant
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information