judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-6039
A-6039
10/04/1956
Application for Writ of Error
GEORGE COWDEN, ET AL.
W. H. BELL
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/14/1957Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
01/09/1957Reply to ResponsePetitioner
01/01/1957Response to PetitionRespondent
10/04/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/20/1957Opinion issued
01/14/1957Supplemental Brief filed
01/09/1957Reply to Response
01/01/1957Response to Petition
11/28/1956Document received (See Remarks)
10/04/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
10/04/1956Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
W. H. BellRespondent
George Cowden, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information