judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-5996
A-5996
08/15/1956
Application for Writ of Error
D. O. PEDDY, ET AL.
HOUSTON PIPE LINE COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/16/1956Response to Brief filedRespondent
11/13/1956Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
11/01/1956Motion for RehearingPetitioner
10/01/1956Reply to ResponsePetitioner
08/23/1956Response to PetitionRespondent
08/15/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/16/1956Response to Brief filed
11/13/1956Brief in Support of Petition
11/01/1956Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/01/1956Reply to Response
08/23/1956Response to Petition
08/15/1956Application for Writ of Error - Filed
08/15/1956Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
D. O. Peddy, et al.Petitioner
HOUSTON PIPE LINE COMPANYRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information