judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-3828
B-3828
02/06/1973
Application for Writ of Error
JAMES RAY KERBY
ABILENE CHRISTIAN COLLEGE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/27/1973Motion for RehearingRespondent
10/25/1973Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
10/10/1973Supplemental Brief filedAmicus Curiae
10/10/1973Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
09/25/1973Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
08/09/1973Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
07/12/1973Motion for RehearingPetitioner
07/10/1973Motion for RehearingRespondent
06/18/1973Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
02/16/1973Response to PetitionRespondent
02/06/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/27/1973Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/12/1973Opinion issued
10/25/1973Supplemental Brief filed
10/10/1973Supplemental Brief filed
10/10/1973Amicus Curiae Brief received
09/25/1973Amicus Curiae Brief received
08/09/1973Amicus Curiae Brief received
07/12/1973Motion for leave to file brief
07/12/1973Motion for RehearingFiling granted
07/10/1973Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/18/1973Supplemental Brief filed
05/02/1973Document received (See Remarks)
02/16/1973Response to Petition
02/06/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
02/06/1973Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Nelson, Sherrod, Carter and OldhamAmicus Curiae
James Ray KerbyPetitioner
Abilene Christian CollegeRespondent
J. A. Gooch, Howard G. Barker,WIlliam B. David and Estil A. Vance, Jr.Amicus Curiae
Underwood, Wilson, Sutton, Heare and BerryAmicus Curiae
Scott Baldwin and Charles Cunningham, et al.Amicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information