judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PICKETT (CARY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 58191
Short Caption:PICKETT (CARY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 65037 , 75042 , 75042-COA , 75468 , 75468-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C262523Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Senior Justice Rose for Justice Cherry
Senior Justice Shearing for Justice Gibbons
Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/15/2011How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/20/2011Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
04/20/2011Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. PICKETT - C262523-2 11-11805
05/09/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Transmit Judgment or Order and Record on Appeal. Order due: 30 days. Record on appeal due: 60 days. 11-13609
05/26/2011Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of Findings of Fact Conclusions of Law and Order filed in district court on May 19, 2011. 11-15510
06/15/2011Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Vol 1. 11-17752
06/15/2011Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Vol 2. 11-17753
06/15/2011Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Vol 3. 11-17754
06/15/2011Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
06/17/2011Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk. Pre-Sentence Investigation (PSI) Report (SEALED)
06/17/2011Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. 11-18150
08/10/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Supplemental Record. Record due: 40 days. 11-24186
08/31/2011Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Supplemental, Volume 4. 11-26506
10/05/2011Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn4[The Honorables Robert Rose and Miriam Shearing, Senior Justices, participated in the decision of this matter under general orders of assignment. We have reviewed all documents that appellant has submitted in proper person to the clerk of this court in this matter, and we conclude that no relief based upon those submissions is warranted.] 11-30381
11/01/2011RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 11-33604
11/01/2011Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/15/2011RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on November 8, 2011. 11-33604