judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-5636
A-5636
01/18/1956
Application for Writ of Error
JOYCE MCALPINE, SUPERVISOR, POTTER COUNTY CHILD WELFARE UNIT
JOAN BELCHER
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/09/1956Motion for RehearingRespondent
05/03/1956Motion for RehearingRespondent
01/25/1956Response to PetitionRespondent
01/18/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/09/1956Motion for Rehearing
05/03/1956Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/18/1956Opinion issued
02/22/1956Document received (See Remarks)
01/25/1956Response to Petition
01/18/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
01/18/1956Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Joyce McAlpine, Supervisor, Potter County Child Welfare UnitPetitioner
Joan BelcherRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information