Case: 05-85-00806-CR
05-85-00806-CR
07/22/1985
Murder
Ike Lee Brown, Jr.
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
01/06/2017 | Retention time case file will be retained | Retain | |
07/11/1986 | Mandate Issued | | |
06/30/1986 | Case Returned from Higher Ct. | | |
01/29/1986 | Petition for Discretionary Review Filed | Refused | |
01/20/1986 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
01/06/1986 | Motion to File Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | |
12/23/1985 | Response to Motion | | |
12/17/1985 | Motion for Leave to File | | |
12/12/1985 | Submitted | | |
11/14/1985 | Brief Filed | | |
11/07/1985 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
10/31/1985 | MattConv | | |
10/31/1985 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
10/11/1985 | Statement of Facts Filed | | |
10/11/1985 | Transcript Filed | | |
10/10/1985 | MattConv | | |
10/01/1985 | Brief Filed | | |
09/18/1985 | MattConv | | |
09/17/1985 | MattConv | | |
07/22/1985 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/20/1986 | Case Stored | Permanent retention required in criminal case |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
THE STATE OF TEXAS | Criminal - State of Texas | |
Brown, Jr., Ike Lee | Criminal - Appellant |
Trial Court Information
283rd Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Dallas District Judge, 283rd District Court
F85-97114-T
Life, TDC & $10000 Fine