Case: 03-0457
03-0457
05/27/2003
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
IN RE TEXAS-NEW MEXICO PIPELINE COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/27/2003 | Appendix Filed | Relator | appendix attached | |
05/27/2003 | Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed | Relator | on behalf of Texas-New Mexico Pipeline Company | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/01/2003 | Case Stored | G02/24-J-5 | | |
06/04/2003 | Status report filed | letter stating El Paso COA denied the mot. for temp. relief that was filed in the companion interlocutory appeal (08-03-00199-CV) | | |
06/03/2003 | Motion for temporary relief disposed | Denied | Motion for temporary relief denied. | |
06/03/2003 | Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposed | Denied with Justice not sitting. | Petition for writ of mandamus is denied. Justice O'Neill not sitting. | |
06/02/2003 | Opinion from the Court of Appeals filed. | Opinion from the El Paso 8th Court of Appeals | | |
05/29/2003 | Response to Motion filed | Eott Energy Pipeline Limited Partnership's response to Texas-New Mexico Pipeline Company's mo for temp. relief | | |
05/27/2003 | Motion for temporary relief | relator Texas-New Mexico Pipeline Company's motion for temp. relief | | |
05/27/2003 | Appendix Filed | appendix attached | | |
05/27/2003 | Case Record Filed | Volume 1 & 2, 1 copy of each | | |
05/27/2003 | Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed | on behalf of Texas-New Mexico Pipeline Company | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
TEXACO TRADING & TRANSPORTATIO | Other interested party | Mr. J. Scott Bardole |
EQUILON ENTERPRISES, LLC | Other interested party | Mr. Michael L. Neely |
EOTT ENERGY PIPELINE LIMITED | Respondent | Ms. Patricia Edna Lin Mr. David W. Holman Ms. Ruth B. Downes Mr. Robert Alan York Mr. Paul M. Bohannon Ms. Sally A. Galley |
SMITH, DALLAS L. | Respondent | Mr. C. H. (Hal) Brockett Jr. |
HOLMES, BARBARA I. | Respondent | Mr. C. Medferd Owen Jr. Ms. Janet R. Pritchett |
HOLMES, JERRY W. | Respondent | Mr. Tom Scott |
ROAM, DEBORAH K. | Respondent | Mr. Andrew Sher |
ROAM, JOHN H. | Respondent | Mr. J. Craig Lewis |
TEXAS-NEW MEXICO PIPELINE COMP | Relator | Mr. James R. Leahy Ms. Elana S. Einhorn Mr. Scott P. Stolley Ms. Elizabeth D. Whitaker Ms. Lauren Carol Hornsby Ms. Deborah G. Hankinson Mr. William L. Banowsky Mr. Michael L. Neely Ms. Elizann Carroll Mr. G. Luke Ashley Ms. Anna E. Cardenas Mr. Gregory W. Curry Ms. Debora B. Alsup |
SHELL PIPELINE CO., LP | Other interested party | |
TEXACO PIPELINE, INC. | Other interested party | Mr. Harper Estes |
Court of Appeals Information:
08-03-00197-CV
Denied
___ SW3d ___, 05-29-03
8th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
238th District Court
Midland
Honorable Billy John Edwards
CV-43,296