judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-89-00418-CR
04-89-00418-CR
08/30/1989
Robbery
Solis, Arturo
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/26/1992No New Event but Update in Calendar
04/20/1992No New Event but Update in Calendar
03/09/1992No New Event but Update in Calendar
01/21/1992Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
01/21/1992Mandate Issued
01/21/1992Mandate Issued
01/15/1992Case Returned from Higher Court
01/14/1992No New Event but Update in CalendarMotion or Writ Denied
01/14/1992No New Event but Update in Calendar
01/10/1992No New Event but Update in Calendar
01/02/1992Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
12/24/1991Motion Filed
12/11/1991Higher Court DecisionRefused
10/04/1991No New Event but Update in Calendar
10/02/1991Case Forwarded to Higher Court
09/26/1991Petition for Review Filed
08/27/1991No New Event but Update in Calendar
08/19/1991No New Event but Update in Calendar
08/08/1991No New Event but Update in Calendar
07/30/1991Motion for Reconsideration DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
07/25/1991Motion for Reconsideration Filed
07/17/1991Motion DisposedFiling is Moot
07/17/1991Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
07/10/1991Motion Filed
07/08/1991Motion for Rehearing Filed
06/19/1991Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
06/13/1991Motion Filed
06/05/1991Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
05/28/1991Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/28/1991Motion EOT to file Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/20/1991Motion Filed
05/20/1991Motion EOT to file Motion for Rehearing Filed
05/20/1991Motion Filed
04/29/1991Motion EOT to file Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion Granted in Part
04/22/1991Motion EOT to file Motion for Rehearing Filed
04/22/1991Motion for Reconsideration Filed
04/10/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/10/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/05/1991Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/25/1991Motion Filed
03/19/1991Submitted
03/19/1991Submission
03/19/1991Submitted
03/15/1991Supplemental Brief Received
03/11/1991Reply brief filed
02/11/1991Submission
02/06/1991Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
02/06/1991Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
01/24/1991Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/22/1991Motion Filed
01/22/1991Motion Filed
01/17/1991Case ready to be set
01/17/1991Brief Recd (If in excess of page limit and/or late)
01/17/1991No Description Available.
01/17/1991Case ready to be set
01/11/1991Brief Filed
01/07/1991Motion Filed
01/07/1991Motion Filed
12/26/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion Granted in Part
12/18/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
12/12/1990Information regarding cause received
11/20/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion Granted in Part
11/19/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
11/14/1990Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/05/1990Motion Filed
10/29/1990Brief Filed
09/27/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion Granted in Part
09/27/1990Motion DisposedMotion Granted in Part
09/25/1990Motion Filed
09/24/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
07/25/1990Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
07/19/1990Motion Filed
06/19/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/19/1990Motion to Abate DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
06/19/1990Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
06/19/1990Motion Filed
06/19/1990Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
06/18/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
06/12/1990No Description Available.
06/12/1990Motion Filed
06/12/1990No Description Available.
06/12/1990No Description Available.
06/12/1990No Description Available.
06/07/1990Motion to Abate Filed
05/24/1990No Description Available.
05/24/1990Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
05/21/1990Motion Filed
05/11/1990No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
05/10/1990No Description Available.
05/10/1990No Description Available.
05/09/1990Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law Filed
05/02/1990Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/25/1990Motion Filed
04/24/1990Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
04/12/1990Motion Filed
03/30/1990Order Entered
03/30/1990Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
03/30/1990Motion DisposedMotion Granted in Part
03/23/1990Motion Filed
03/20/1990Affidavit for Motion Filed
02/26/1990Motion DisposedAbeyance
02/16/1990Motion Filed
02/06/1990Motion to Abate DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
02/01/1990Motion to Abate Filed
01/22/1990No Description Available.
01/22/1990No Description Available.
11/27/1989Motion DisposedDismissed
11/22/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Denied
11/17/1989No Description Available.
11/17/1989Motion Filed
11/01/1989No Description Available.Motion Granted in Part
10/30/1989No Description Available.
10/30/1989No Description Available.
10/19/1989No Description Available.
08/30/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/27/1989Motion for New Trial Filed
07/27/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
06/29/1989Date of Sentencing in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/21/1992Case StoredCase stored
04/28/2014Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
226th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Sid L. Harle
89-CR-1912
35 years TDC