judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals

Case: 13-89-00348-CV
13-89-00348-CV
08/30/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Perez, Herlinda, Individually, et al.
Lear Sieglar, Inc., Dallas Lite and Barricade, Inc., et al.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/13/1991Mandate Recd Ct Crim App / Dt. Clk
11/20/1991Higher Court DecisionReversed & Affirmed in part
02/27/1991Higher Court DecisionMotion or Writ Granted
01/09/1991Cite for opinions
11/30/1990Application of Writ of Error sent to Supreme Court
11/28/1990Letter sent
11/08/1990Writ Filed
11/08/1990Writ of Error Fee Paid
10/11/1990Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
10/08/1990Response to _____________.
09/14/1990Motion for rehearing filed
08/31/1990Opinion issuedReversed, Remanded in part & Affirmed in part
05/02/1990Additional copies of letter brief
04/26/1990Submitted
04/26/1990Letter brief filed
04/26/1990Submission
04/11/1990Panel change on case on SMIS or SMIT
03/06/1990Entry of Judge Selection for Case.
03/05/1990Submission
12/27/1989Brief Filed
12/27/1989Oral argument requested
12/21/1989Brief Filed
12/21/1989Oral argument requested
12/18/1989Due date for record to be filed
11/30/1989Miscellaneous Motion DisposedDismissed as Moot
11/21/1989Miscellaneous Motion
11/21/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/21/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/21/1989Motion to Supplement DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/17/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/17/1989Supplemental transcript recieved
11/17/1989Sworn Statement filed
11/17/1989Filing Fee Paid
11/17/1989Supplemental transcript filed
11/14/1989Motion to Supplement
11/13/1989Green card in
11/13/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/09/1989Motion to Supplement DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/07/1989ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come
11/07/198910 day letter sent
11/03/1989Oral argument requested
11/03/1989Appellant's Brief Received
11/03/1989Brief Filed
11/03/1989Case ready to be set
10/27/1989Supplemental transcript recieved
10/27/1989Sworn Statement filed
10/27/1989Filing Fee Paid
10/27/1989Supplemental transcript filed
10/26/1989Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/26/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
10/24/1989Motion to supplement transcript
10/13/1989Miscellaneous Motion
10/13/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/12/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
10/05/1989Miscellaneous Motion
10/05/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
09/29/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
09/25/1989Letter sent
09/25/1989Address Change
09/22/1989Letter sent
09/21/1989Green card in
09/19/198910 day letter sent
09/08/1989Letter sent
08/31/1989Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks
08/31/1989Statement of Facts Received
08/31/1989Filing Fee Paid
08/31/1989Statement of Facts Filed
08/30/1989Transcript Filed
08/30/1989Transcript Received
08/30/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/13/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
139th District Court
Hidalgo
Honorable Raul L Longoria
C-147-86-C