judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals

Case: 02-89-00222-CR
02-89-00222-CR
08/31/1989
Other Felony
Baty, Ex Parte Connie Manthei
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/13/1990Mandate Issued
03/28/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
03/15/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
02/28/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/23/1990Submitted
01/23/1990Submission
01/22/1990Order Entered
11/27/1989Submission
11/27/1989Brief Filed
11/14/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/13/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
10/23/1989Brief Filed
10/18/1989No Description Available.
10/13/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/13/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
10/12/1989No Description Available.
09/27/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/26/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
09/11/1989Criminal record or relator's record and/or exhibits
08/31/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
08/31/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/13/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
213th District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Keith Nelson, Judge, 78th District Court
C-644