judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 11th Court Of Appeals

Case: 11-89-00246-CV
11-89-00246-CV
08/31/1989
Wills & Estates
Wilson, Katherine & R.E. Wilson,Executors of Whitmire Estate
Green, Maxwell D., Administrator of Whitmire Estate
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/20/1989Mandate issued
10/12/1989Motion to dismiss disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/27/1989Mot. - To dismiss appeal filed
09/27/1989Record checked in
09/14/1989Record checked out
09/06/1989SF filed
08/31/1989exempt from rec.filing fees or motion filing fees
08/31/1989TR filed
08/31/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/20/1989Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Katherine & R. E. WilsonAppellant
Maxwell D. GreenAppellee
Trial Court Information
118th District Court
Howard
Honorable James W. Gregg
33,124