judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals

Case: 02-89-00182-CV
02-89-00182-CV
07/21/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Chiles, George Vernon
Wadsworth Golf Construction Company of the Midwest
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/07/1990Opinion issuedMotion or Writ Denied
09/07/1990Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
08/08/1990Brief Filed
08/08/1990Motion Filed
05/29/1990Mandate Issued
04/10/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
12/12/1989Submitted
12/12/1989Submission
11/08/1989Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
10/23/1989Motion Filed
10/18/1989Letter Brief Filed
09/25/1989Brief Filed
09/13/1989Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
09/11/1989Response Filed
09/05/1989Other Document Filed
08/30/1989Motion for Dismissal Filed
08/29/1989Submission
08/25/1989No Description Available.
08/09/1989Motion for Extension to file Transcript DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/21/1989Motion for Extension to File Transcript Filed
07/21/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/29/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
352nd District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Ira Sam Houston
-112380-