judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-89-00865-CR
05-89-00865-CR
07/21/1989
Sexual Abuse, Rape or Injury of a Child
Wickware, Garry
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/17/2000Letter Sent by the Court
05/16/2000Letter Received
03/27/1991Mandate Issued
03/27/1991Mandate Issued
03/15/1991Case Returned from Higher Ct.
12/06/1990Petition for Discretionary Review FiledRefused
11/14/1990Ext to File Petition for Discretionary Review-CCA
10/10/1990Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
10/10/1990Opinion issuedModified/Reformed and Affirmed
10/10/1990Opinion issuedModified/Reformed and Affirmed
09/19/1990Submitted
09/19/1990Submission
09/19/1990Submission
09/19/1990Submitted
06/29/1990MattConv
02/28/1990Brief Filed
02/28/1990Case ready to be set
02/28/1990Case ready to be set
02/15/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/13/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/30/1990Mot. for Ext. to File BriefMotion or Writ Granted
01/29/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/03/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/02/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/05/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/04/1989Brief Filed
12/04/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/07/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/06/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/11/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
10/10/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
09/08/1989Statement of Facts Filed
09/05/1989Transcript Filed
07/21/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/10/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
07/10/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/27/1991Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 1
Dallas
Honorable Donald R. Ross
F89-95025-TH
65 yrs TDC