judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals

Case: 02-89-00192-CR
02-89-00192-CR
07/21/1989
Other Felony
Prater, Monty Christopher
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/17/1990Mandate Issued
08/01/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/21/1990Submitted
06/21/1990Submission
05/15/1990Letter
02/22/1990Brief Filed
02/08/1990Submission
02/08/1990Brief Filed
02/08/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/08/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
02/06/1990Notice to Attorneys of no Brief Filed
01/02/1990No Description Available.
12/06/1989Order EnteredAbated
11/15/1989Notice to Attorneys of no Brief Filed
10/23/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/23/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
09/20/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/20/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
08/14/1989Criminal record or relator's record and/or exhibits
07/21/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
07/21/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/17/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 3
Tarrant
Honorable Don Leonard, Criminal District Court No. 3
0359287D
35 yrs., TDC