judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-9195
A-9195
08/11/1962
Application for Writ of Error
MARY JANE HAMILTON
EARL PODOLNICK, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/29/1963Reply to ResponsePetitioner
01/17/1963Motion for RehearingPetitioner
08/30/1962Response to PetitionRespondent
08/11/1962Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/29/1963Reply to Response
01/28/1963Response to Motion filed
01/17/1963Motion for RehearingOverruled
08/30/1962Response to Petition
08/11/1962Application for Writ of Error - Filed
08/11/1962Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Earl Podolnick, et al.Respondent
Mary Jane HamiltonPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information