judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-2623
A-2623
03/28/1950
Application for Writ of Error
HASTINGS OIL COMPANY, ET AL.
TEXAS COMPANY, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/01/1950Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/29/1950Response to Brief filedPetitioner
05/24/1950Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
04/07/1950Response to PetitionRespondent
03/28/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
08/15/1952Motion to Withdraw Filed
12/13/1950Response to Motion filed
12/01/1950Additional Copies received
12/01/1950Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/15/1950Opinion issued
05/29/1950Response to Brief filed
05/24/1950Supplemental Brief filed
04/26/1950Document received (See Remarks)
04/26/1950Document received (See Remarks)
04/26/1950Document received (See Remarks)
04/26/1950Document received (See Remarks)
04/26/1950Document received (See Remarks)
04/26/1950Document received (See Remarks)
04/07/1950Response to Petition
03/28/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
03/28/1950Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas Company, et al.Respondent
Hastings Oil Company, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information