judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-2125
A-2125
03/15/1949
Application for Writ of Error
INSURERS INDEMNITY AND INSURANCE COMPANY
MRS. MINNIE PRIDGEN, TRADERS AND GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, TEXAS EMPLOYERS INSURANCE ASSOCIATION, MRS MINNIE PRIDGEN, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
08/05/1949Brief in Support of PetitionRespondent
08/05/1949Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
08/04/1949Motion for RehearingRespondent
08/03/1949Motion for RehearingRespondent
06/18/1949Response to PetitionRespondent
06/14/1949Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
03/25/1949Response to PetitionRespondent
03/25/1949Response to PetitionRespondent
03/22/1949Response to PetitionRespondent
03/15/1949Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
03/15/1949Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/09/1966Letter Filed
08/05/1949Brief in Support of Petition
08/05/1949Supplemental Brief filed
08/04/1949Motion for Rehearing
08/03/1949Motion for Rehearing
07/28/1949Letter Filed
06/18/1949Response to Petition
06/14/1949Supplemental Brief filed
05/18/1949Document received (See Remarks)
05/18/1949Document received (See Remarks)
05/18/1949Document received (See Remarks)
03/25/1949Response to Petition
03/25/1949Response to Petition
03/22/1949Response to Petition
03/15/1949Application for Writ of Error - Filed
03/15/1949Application for Writ of Error - Filed
03/15/1949Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mrs. Minnie PridgenRespondent
Traders and General Insurance CompanyRespondent
Texas Employers Insurance AssociationRespondent
Insurers Indemnity and Insurance CompanyPetitioner
Mrs Minnie Pridgen, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information