judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-9094
A-9094
06/25/1962
Application for Writ of Error
HARTFORD ACCIDENT AND INDEMNITY COMPANY
GEORGE MCCARDELL
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/10/1963Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/14/1963Post submission brief filedRespondent
12/10/1962Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
08/08/1962Response to PetitionRespondent
06/25/1962Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/20/1963Returned document(s). See Remarks.
07/10/1963Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/26/1963Concurring and Dissenting Opinion delivered
06/26/1963Concurring Opinion issued.
06/26/1963Opinion issued
01/14/1963Post submission brief filed
12/22/1962Miscellaneous Motion
12/10/1962Amicus Curiae Brief received
10/31/1962Document received (See Remarks)
10/31/1962Document received (See Remarks)
10/31/1962Document received (See Remarks)
08/08/1962Response to Petition
06/25/1962Response to Motion filed
06/25/1962Miscellaneous Motion
06/25/1962Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
06/25/1962Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Gilbert T. Adams, Joe H. Tonshill, Ward Stephenson, Alto V. Watson and Ernest L.SampleAmicus Curiae
George McCardellRespondent
Hartford Accident and Indemnity CompanyPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information