judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-9108
A-9108
06/29/1962
Application for Writ of Error
H. B. MASON, JR.
KATIE B. MASON, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS INDEPENDENT EXECUTRIX AND TRUSTEE OF THE ESTATE OF H. B. MASON, DECEASED
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/10/1963Motion for RehearingRespondent
02/25/1963Response to Brief filedRespondent
02/13/1963Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
02/13/1963Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
01/02/1963Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
11/27/1962Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
11/16/1962Motion for RehearingPetitioner
07/16/1962Response to PetitionRespondent
06/29/1962Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/18/1963Response to Motion filed
04/10/1963Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/27/1963Opinion issued
02/25/1963Response to Brief filed
02/13/1963Brief in Support of Petition
02/13/1963Amicus Curiae Brief received
02/12/1963Miscellaneous Motion
01/16/1963Response to Motion filed
01/02/1963Amicus Curiae Brief received
11/27/1962Motion for leave to file brief
11/27/1962Supplemental Brief filed
11/16/1962Motion for RehearingFiling granted
07/16/1962Response to Petition
06/29/1962Application for Writ of Error - Filed
06/29/1962Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Roberto M. Benavides, Tom N. Goodwin, John E. Fitzgibbon and William C. WrightAmicus Curiae
H. B. Mason, Jr.Petitioner
Katie B. Mason, individually and as Independent Executrix and Trustee of the Estate of H. B. Mason, deceasedRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information