judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-9079
A-9079
06/14/1962
Application for Writ of Error
LYNN MALLOW, ET AL.
CITY OF DENTON, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
08/01/1962Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/28/1962Response to PetitionRespondent
06/25/1962Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
06/20/1962Response to PetitionPetitioner
06/14/1962Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
06/14/1962Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
08/01/1962Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/28/1962Response to Petition
06/25/1962Brief in Support of Petition
06/20/1962Response to Petition
06/14/1962Application for Writ of Error - Filed
06/14/1962Application for Writ of Error - Filed
06/14/1962Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
City of Denton, et al.Respondent
Lynn Mallow, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information