judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-9142
A-9142
07/16/1962
Application for Writ of Error
TRAVIS WARD
FAIRWAY OPERATING COMPANY, INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/23/1963Motion for RehearingRespondent
12/24/1962Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
09/27/1962Reply to ResponsePetitioner
09/13/1962Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
07/31/1962Response to PetitionRespondent
07/16/1962Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/01/1963Response to Motion filed
01/23/1963Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/09/1963Opinion issued
12/24/1962Supplemental Brief filed
11/26/1962Letter Filed
10/03/1962Document received (See Remarks)
09/27/1962Reply to Response
09/13/1962Supplemental Brief filed
07/31/1962Response to Petition
07/16/1962Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
07/16/1962Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
TRAVIS WARDPetitioner
Fairway Operating Company, Inc.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information