judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-2227
A-2227
05/09/1949
Application for Writ of Error
EAST TEXAS MOTOR FRIEGHT LINES
RICHARD L. LOFTIS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/20/1949Motion for RehearingRespondent
07/08/1949Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
07/04/1949Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
06/08/1949Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
05/09/1949Response to PetitionRespondent
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/20/1949Motion for Rehearing
10/05/1949Opinion issued
07/09/1949Motion to dismiss
07/08/1949Supplemental Brief filed
07/04/1949Brief in Support of Petition
06/08/1949Document received (See Remarks)
06/08/1949Application for Writ of Error - Filed
05/09/1949Response to Petition
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Richard L. LoftisRespondent
East Texas Motor Frieght LinesPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information