judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-1197-89
PD-1197-89
08/28/1989
PDR Case Type
POE, DONALD ROBERT
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/28/1989FINAL DISPRefused
11/08/1989PDR DISPRefused
09/28/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
08/28/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/05/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn C. Vance
POE, DONALD ROBERTApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Lawrence B. Mitchell
Court of Appeals Information:
05-88-00690-CR
Aff 7-19-89
5th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
283rd District Court
Dallas
Honorable JACK HAMPTON
F84-88253-PT