judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-89-00300-CV
08-89-00300-CV
08/28/1989
Other Personal Injury
Green, Dorece and husband, Oscar Green
Nalin H. Tolia,M.D.,John M. Sheets,M.D.,& Terry D. Tubb,M.D.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/17/2011Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
08/28/1990Shuck purged
08/28/1990Mandate Issued
08/28/1990Mandate Issued
08/08/1990Case Returned from Higher Court
08/08/1990Decision from Supreme Court or CCAMotion or Writ Denied
05/21/1990Case Forwarded to Higher Court
05/10/1990Application for Writ of Error
05/10/1990Fee paid
04/23/1990Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/21/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/21/1990Opinion Withdrawn
03/21/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
03/16/1990Fee paid
03/15/1990Response to Petition, Motion or Inquiry
03/08/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
02/21/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/21/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/02/1990Submitted
02/02/1990Submission
02/02/1990Submitted
12/22/1989Submission
11/30/1989Brief Filed
11/30/1989Case ready to be set
11/30/1989Case ready to be set
11/27/1989Brief Filed
11/10/1989Response to Petition, Motion or Inquiry
11/01/1989Brief Filed
11/01/1989Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
11/01/1989Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
11/01/1989Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
11/01/1989Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/01/1989Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/01/1989Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/31/1989Amended Motion Filed to Correct Original Motion
10/27/1989Brief Filed
10/27/1989Statement of Facts Filed
10/26/1989Amended Motion Filed to Correct Original Motion
10/25/1989Motion postponed, to be heard later
10/23/1989Motion for Dismissal Filed
10/23/1989Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
10/20/1989Motion for Dismissal Filed
10/20/1989Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
10/16/1989Motion for Dismissal Filed
10/16/1989Statement of Facts Filed
10/10/1989Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
10/04/1989Brief Filed
10/04/1989Filed Ltr re req. for oral argument
10/04/1989Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/04/1989Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/04/1989Order entered
10/02/1989Brief Filed
09/25/1989Response to Petition, Motion or Inquiry
09/20/1989Miscellaneous Motion Filed
09/20/1989Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
09/20/1989Supplemental Transcript Filed
09/13/1989Motion for Extension Statement of Facts DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
09/07/1989Miscellaneous filing
08/30/1989Fee paid
08/30/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
08/30/1989Transcript Filed
08/28/1989Fee paid
08/28/1989Motion - Extension to File Statement of Facts filed
08/28/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/17/2011Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppelleeHon. Perry Davis, Jr.
UnknownAppelleeHon. Barbara A. Goolsby
UnknownAppelleeHon. Jack Q. Tidwell
UnknownAppellee
UnknownAppellantHon. Gerald K. Fugit
UnknownAppelleeHon. Michael McKinney
Trial Court Information
358th District Court
Ector
Honorable Bill McCoy
D-79,629