judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-9207
A-9207
08/17/1962
Application for Writ of Error
CHRIS MATTERN
MAQADELINA HERZOG, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/02/1963Motion for RehearingRespondent
01/11/1963Response to PetitionRespondent
08/28/1962Response to PetitionRespondent
08/17/1962Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/05/1963Response to Motion filed
05/02/1963Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/17/1963Dissenting opinion issued.
04/17/1963Opinion issued
01/11/1963Response to Petition
01/08/1963Motion to amend application for writ of error
11/28/1962Document received (See Remarks)
08/28/1962Response to Petition
08/17/1962Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
08/17/1962Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Chris MatternPetitioner
Maqadelina Herzog, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information