judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-9224
A-9224
08/31/1962
Application for Writ of Error
EASTWOOD MODEL MARKET
STATE OF TEXAS, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/07/1963Brief on the MeritsRespondent
12/18/1962Exhibits in case/cause filedPetitioner
12/18/1962Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
10/31/1962Motion for RehearingPetitioner
09/17/1962Response to PetitionRespondent
08/31/1962Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/20/1963Opinion issued
01/07/1963Brief on the Merits
12/18/1962Exhibits in case/cause filed
12/18/1962Brief on the Merits
11/14/1962Document received (See Remarks)
10/31/1962Motion for RehearingFiling granted
09/17/1962Response to Petition
08/31/1962Application for Writ of Error - Filed
08/31/1962Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
State of Texas, et al.Respondent
Eastwood Model MarketPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information