judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals

Case: 02-89-00218-CR
02-89-00218-CR
08/25/1989
Burglary
Jones, Bobby Joe aka Robert Williams
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/21/1992Mandate Issued
06/02/1992Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
04/28/1992Motion for Rehearing Filed
04/14/1992Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/05/1990Submitted
12/05/1990Submission
10/03/1990Brief Filed
09/19/1990Letter
08/08/1990Brief Filed
08/08/1990Case ready to be set
06/12/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/11/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
05/31/1990Brief Filed
05/31/1990Submission
03/28/1990Exhibits Filed
03/28/1990No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
03/28/1990No Description Available.
03/27/1990No Description Available.
03/26/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/23/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
03/23/1990Notice to Attorneys of no Brief Filed
03/09/1990No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
03/07/1990No Description Available.
03/01/1990No Description Available.
02/05/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/05/1990No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
02/01/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
02/01/1990No Description Available.
01/25/1990Notice to Attorneys of no Brief Filed
11/21/1989Order Entered
11/15/1989No Description Available.
11/13/1989Notice to Attorneys of no Brief Filed
10/20/1989No Description Available.
08/25/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
08/25/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/21/1992Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Unknown UserCriminal - State of Texas
Jones, Bobby Joe Aka Robert WiCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
43rd District Court
Parker
Honorable James O. Mullin, Judge, 43rd District Court
10366
60 yrs., TDC