judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-89-00411-CR
04-89-00411-CR
08/25/1989
All Misdemeanors
Hernandez, Alfred Torres
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/02/1990Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
03/12/1990Mandate received by the trial court
03/06/1990Mandate Issued
03/06/1990Mandate Issued
01/10/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/10/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/27/1989Submitted
12/27/1989Submission
12/27/1989Submitted
12/05/1989Submission
12/01/1989Case ready to be set
12/01/1989Brief Filed
12/01/1989Case ready to be set
11/07/1989Brief Filed
10/11/1989No Description Available.
08/25/1989No Description Available.
08/25/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/23/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
08/23/1989Date of Sentencing in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/06/2015RetentionDate criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate)
04/02/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 5
Bexar
Honorable Timothy Johnson
412397
1 year prob, $100 fine