judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0960-89
PD-0960-89
07/06/1989
PDR Case Type
PARLIN, RICHARD JOSEPH
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/20/1989FINAL DISPRefused
10/04/1989PDR DISPRefused
08/08/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
07/06/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/01/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
PARLIN, RICHARD JOSEPHApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Linda Icenhauer-Ramirez
STATE OF TEXASStateRonald Earle
Court of Appeals Information:
03-88-00104-CR
Ref & Aff 5-17-89
3rd Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
299th District Court
Travis
Honorable JON N. WISSER
77,231