judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals

Case: 02-89-00155-CV
02-89-00155-CV
07/06/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Sklan, Harold, as Attorney-in-Fact
Wichita Appraisal Review Board & Wichita Appraisal District
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/05/1991Mandate Issued
06/19/1991Writ DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
04/11/1991Writ Filed
03/12/1991Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
01/23/1991Motion for Rehearing Filed
01/08/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/27/1990Submitted
06/27/1990Submission
05/14/1990Order Entered
02/23/1990Order Entered
01/23/1990Motion for Continuance DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/19/1990Motion for Continuance Filed
11/30/1989No Description Available.
11/06/1989Brief Filed
10/13/1989Brief Filed
10/10/1989Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/04/1989Response Filed
09/29/1989Motion Filed
09/15/1989No Description Available.
09/15/1989Submission
09/01/1989No Description Available.
08/16/1989Motion DisposedAbated
08/16/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
08/01/1989No Description Available.
07/28/1989Motion Filed
07/18/1989No Description Available.
07/06/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
07/06/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/05/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Wichita Appraisal Review BoardAppellee
Sklan, Harold As Atty-in-factAppellant
Wichita Appraisal DistrictAppellee
Trial Court Information
30th District Court
Wichita
Honorable Calvin Ashley
129,583-A