judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-2155
A-2155
03/30/1949
Application for Writ of Error
MARGARET FAYE GREER, GLADYS GREER NOBLES, ET VIR
FRANKLIN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/04/1949Motion for RehearingPetitioner
07/01/1949Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/03/1949Response to Brief filedPetitioner
06/02/1949Response to Brief filedPetitioner
05/30/1949Brief on the MeritsRespondent
05/26/1949Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
04/11/1949Response to PetitionRespondent
04/11/1949Response to PetitionRespondent
03/30/1949Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
03/30/1949Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/04/1949Motion for Rehearing
07/01/1949Motion for Rehearing
06/03/1949Response to Brief filed
06/02/1949Response to Brief filed
05/30/1949Brief on the Merits
05/26/1949Brief on the Merits
04/20/1949Document received (See Remarks)
04/20/1949Document received (See Remarks)
04/20/1949Document received (See Remarks)
04/11/1949Response to Petition
04/11/1949Response to Petition
03/31/1949Document received (See Remarks)
03/30/1949Application for Writ of Error - Filed
03/30/1949Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Margaret Faye GreerPetitioner
Gladys Greer Nobles, et virPetitioner
Franklin Life Insurance CompanyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information