judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-2195
A-2195
04/19/1949
Application for Writ of Error
WINNIE TOLBERT AND J. R. TOLBERT
STANDARD ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/20/1949Motion for RehearingRespondent
06/06/1949Brief on the MeritsRespondent
05/09/1949Reply to ResponsePetitioner
04/29/1949Response to PetitionRespondent
04/19/1949Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/31/1949Response to Motion filed
10/20/1949Motion for Rehearing
10/05/1949Opinion issued
06/06/1949Brief on the Merits
05/11/1949Document received (See Remarks)
05/09/1949Reply to Response
04/29/1949Response to Petition
04/19/1949Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Winnie Tolbert and J. R. TolbertPetitioner
Standard Accident Insurance CompanyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information