judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-2198
A-2198
04/21/1949
Application for Writ of Error
LITTLE ROCK FURNITURE MANUFACTURING COMPANY
R. L. DUNN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/13/1949Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/28/1949Brief on the MeritsRespondent
04/30/1949Response to PetitionRespondent
04/21/1949Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/18/1949Response to Motion filed
07/13/1949Motion for Rehearing
05/28/1949Brief on the Merits
05/11/1949Document received (See Remarks)
04/30/1949Response to Petition
04/21/1949Application for Writ of Error - Filed
04/21/1949Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Little Rock Furniture Manufacturing CompanyPetitioner
R. L. DunnRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information