judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-89-00895-CV
01-89-00895-CV
09/05/1989
Automobile Personal Injury
Yap, Henry
ANR Freight Systems, et. al.
No
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/09/1995Exhibits picked up by appropriate attorney of record
07/03/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
07/03/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
06/09/1990No petition for review or writ of error was filed
06/04/1990Date final opinion release for publication
05/25/1990Motion for rehearing was not filed
05/10/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/10/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/17/1990Submitted
04/17/1990Submission
04/17/1990Submitted
03/19/1990Order entered
01/30/1990Submission
01/30/1990Submission
01/02/1990Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
01/02/1990Case ready to be set
01/02/1990Case ready to be set
12/14/1989Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
11/29/1989Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
11/07/1989Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
10/19/1989Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
10/04/1989Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
09/11/1989Filing fee paid
09/07/1989Statement of facts filed
09/05/1989Transcript filed
09/05/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/12/1989Appeal bond filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/03/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateAppellantHon. John F. Vecchio
StateAppelleeJeffrey H. Marsh
Trial Court Information
234th District Court
Harris
87-14734