judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-89-00856-CR
01-89-00856-CR
08/21/1989
Robbery
Richard, Connelly Lee
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/16/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
10/16/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
09/15/1990No petition for review or writ of error was filed
08/31/1990Motion for rehearing was not filed
08/16/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/16/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/26/1990Submitted
06/26/1990Submission
06/26/1990Submitted
05/02/1990Submission
04/12/1990Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
04/12/1990Case ready to be set
04/12/1990Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
04/12/1990Case ready to be set
04/03/1990Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
03/15/1990Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
03/05/1990Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
02/05/1990Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
01/25/1990Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Motion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
01/15/1990Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
12/28/1989Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
12/15/1989Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
11/22/1989Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
11/10/1989Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
10/16/1989Statement of facts filed
10/13/1989Transcript filed
08/21/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/16/1989Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
08/16/1989Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/16/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes
StateCriminal - AppellantDick Psenda
Trial Court Information
178th District Court
Harris
528,668
60 yrs tdc & $7,500