judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals

Case: 13-89-00344-CR
13-89-00344-CR
08/22/1989
Assault & battery
Aleman, Arturo
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/31/1990Mandate Issued
07/13/1990ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come
06/27/1990ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come
06/07/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/05/1990Submitted
04/05/1990Submission
02/26/1990Submission
02/06/1990ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come
01/22/1990Brief Filed
01/17/1990Entry of Judge Selection for Case.
01/11/1990Submission
12/28/1989Brief Filed
12/28/1989Case ready to be set
12/14/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/06/1989Additional copies of motion for extension of time
12/01/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/09/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
11/03/1989Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks
11/03/1989Statement of Facts Received
11/03/1989Statement of Facts Filed
10/25/1989Addtl copies of the motion for exten of time SOF
10/25/1989Sworn Statement filed
10/20/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
10/18/1989Green card in
10/17/198910 day letter sent
10/16/1989Due date for record to be filed
10/05/1989Transcript Filed
08/22/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
08/22/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/31/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
36th District Court
San Patricio
Honorable Ronald Yeager
7458
8 yrs tdc prob & $4000