judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 11th Court Of Appeals

Case: 11-89-00239-CV
11-89-00239-CV
08/22/1989
Divorce
Decker, Danny Gene
Hatfield, Cynthia Lynn [Decker]
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/11/1991Mandate issued
06/05/1991Case returned from higher court
05/30/1991Mot. - For rehearing disposedOverruled
04/24/1991Application for writ of error disposedDismissed
01/22/1991Case forwarded to higher court
01/09/1991Application fee paid
01/09/1991Application for writ of error
01/09/1991Express fee paid
12/06/1990Mot. - For rehearing disposedOverruled
11/23/1990Mot. - For rehearing filed
11/08/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/14/1990Submitted
06/14/1990Submission set in Eastland
03/28/1990Submission set in Eastland
03/15/1990Mot. - for postponement disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/14/1990Mot. - to postpone filed
03/14/1990Cancellation of submission date
03/14/1990Phone call - we receive from lawyers, etc.
11/27/1989Submission set in Eastland
11/22/1989Mot. - Ext. to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/16/1989Case ready to be set
11/16/1989Brief filed
11/02/1989Mot. - Ext. to file brief
10/12/1989Mot. - Ext. to file brief disposedWrit or Motion Granted in Part
09/26/1989Mot. - Ext. to file brief
09/21/1989Brief filed
08/22/1989Filing fee paid
08/22/1989Clerk and/or Reporter's Record filed
08/22/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/11/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Hatfield, Cynthia Lynn DeckerAppellantGarry Lewellen
Decker, Danny GeneAppellantMartin L. Peterson, Assistant
Hatfield, Cynthia Lynn [DeckerAppelleeGary Connally
Trial Court Information
266th District Court
Erath
Honorable Donald R. Jones, Retired Judge
87-02-17938