judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals

Case: 13-89-00343-CV
13-89-00343-CV
08/22/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Hannah, Tommy N.
Golden Banner Press
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/14/1990Mandate Issued
07/18/1990ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come
06/29/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
01/24/1990Supplemental Citations
01/18/1990Submitted
01/18/1990Supplemental Citations
01/18/1990Submission
01/10/1990Entry of Judge Selection for Case.
12/20/1989Submission
10/16/1989No oral argument requested
10/16/1989Address Change
10/16/1989Brief Filed
09/20/1989Brief Filed
09/20/1989Oral argument requested
09/20/1989Case ready to be set
09/06/1989Due date for record to be filed
08/25/1989Filing Fee Paid
08/22/1989Transcript Filed
08/22/1989Transcript Received
08/22/1989Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks
08/22/1989Statement of Facts Received
08/22/1989Statement of Facts Filed
08/22/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/14/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
214th District Court
Nueces
Honorable Michael J. Westergren
87-1302-F