judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: C-8983
C-8983
08/22/1989
App Writ of Error
CONTINENTAL STEEL COMPANY
H. A. LOTT INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
11/17/1989Reply BriefRespondentREPLY TO MO TO CONSOLIDATE C-8983 WITH C-9230.
09/25/1989Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)BEHALF OF BUTLER & BINION, ATTY- HAMMETT, JR. & TAYLOR, 1600 FIRST INTERSTATE BANK PLAZA
09/06/1989Reply to ResponseRespondent
09/05/1989Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)CONSTRUCTION INVESTMENTS, FULBRIGHT & JAWORSKI, BEN TAYLOR, R. PALMER, 1301 MCKINNEY, HOUSTON 77010 (713) 651-5151
08/22/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
01/08/1990Record returned to Court of AppealsNO REHEARING FILED
12/06/1989Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDenied
11/22/1989Letter FiledNO OBJECTION TO MO TO CONSOLIDATE
11/17/1989Reply BriefREPLY TO MO TO CONSOLIDATE C-8983 WITH C-9230.
09/25/1989Amicus Curiae Brief receivedBEHALF OF BUTLER & BINION, ATTY- HAMMETT, JR. & TAYLOR, 1600 FIRST INTERSTATE BANK PLAZA
09/07/1989Case forwarded to Court
09/07/1989No description available.
09/06/1989Reply to Response
09/05/1989Amicus Curiae Brief receivedCONSTRUCTION INVESTMENTS, FULBRIGHT & JAWORSKI, BEN TAYLOR, R. PALMER, 1301 MCKINNEY, HOUSTON 77010 (713) 651-5151
08/22/1989Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
01/08/1990Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Court of Appeals Information:
05-87-01072-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
772 SW2d 513, 05-22-89
5th Court of Appeals
Honorable ANNETTE STEWART
Trial Court Information
44th District Court
Dallas
Honorable Candace Tyson
84-7528-B