judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-89-00797-CR
14-89-00797-CR
08/23/1989
Sexual Abuse or Rape of Child
Zuniga, Victor
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/04/1991Case stored
11/14/1990Mandate Issued
11/14/1990Mandate Issued
10/30/1990Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDREFUSED
10/03/1990Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDREFUSED
08/06/1990Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
07/23/1990Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
07/06/1990No motion for rehearing FILED
07/02/1990Reply Brief Filed
06/21/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
06/21/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
06/20/1990Submitted
06/20/1990Submission
06/20/1990Submitted
06/01/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
06/01/1990Case ready to be set
06/01/1990Case ready to be set
05/17/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
05/07/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
04/06/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
03/15/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
03/09/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
02/08/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
02/05/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
01/11/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
01/03/1990No description available.
01/02/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
11/30/1989Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
11/02/1989Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
10/12/1989Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
08/23/1989Transcript FILED
08/23/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/14/1989Motion for new trial FILED
05/17/1989Date of Sentence
05/16/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/04/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantWilliam M. Hicks
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasRoger L. Ezell
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
10th District Court
Galveston
Honorable PUTNAM REITER
88CR0652
50 years TDC