judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: C-8987
C-8987
08/23/1989
App Writ of Error
HERCULES ENGINEERING AND TESTING SERVICES INC. ET AL.
JOSEPH STANLEY and OBIE MORRISON
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/25/1989Reply to ResponseRespondentON BEHALF OF JAMES S. BISSETT
09/13/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitionerAPP N0#2: STANLEY AND MORRISON
08/23/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitionerAPP N0#1: HERCULES ENGINEERING
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
11/16/1989Record returned to Court of AppealsNO REHEARING FILED
10/25/1989Application for Writ of Error - DisposedTwo applications for writ of error denied.APP # 1 - HERCULES ENGINEERING
10/25/1989Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDeniedAPP # 2 - JOSEPH STANLEY & OBIE MORRISON
10/05/1989Case forwarded to Court
10/05/1989No description available.
09/25/1989Reply to ResponseON BEHALF OF JAMES S. BISSETT
09/13/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledAPP N0#2: STANLEY AND MORRISON
08/23/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledAPP N0#1: HERCULES ENGINEERING
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
11/16/1989Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
HASHEM, ZAFERPetitionerMr. Stephen W. Schueler
BISSETT, JAMES S.PetitionerMr. Stephen W. Schueler
Court of Appeals Information:
01-88-00804-CV
Reversed & Remanded
Rule 90, 06-15-89
1st Court of Appeals
Honorable JON N. HUGHES
Trial Court Information
334th District Court
Harris
Honorable Marsha Anthony
85-36992